Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1418 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 32068 Week
» 130713 Month
» 333377 Year
» 3360230 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
537 |
m/e |
11/1912 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3537 |
m/e |
03/1927 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4186 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
64186 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt / N. Gresley |
Class |
J6 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
271 |
Works Number |
1363 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 03/01/1958 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 2 mths , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1958 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
35B |
Grantham |
w/e |
04/02/1951 |
ALLOC |
34D |
Hitchin (GNR) |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
03/01/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1940 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 537 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1363 |
|
|
03/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3537 |
|
|
11/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4186 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64186 |
|
|
04/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (35B) |
|
|
17/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (35B) |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) |
|
|
03/01/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64186 |
|
|
02/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|