Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1312 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14718 Week
» 67734 Month
» 187261 Year
» 3214114 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
39 |
m/e |
12/1909 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3039 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5498 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
65498 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
J5 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Order Number |
260 |
Works Number |
1254 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1909 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 30/12/1955 |
Service Life |
46 yrs , 1 mth |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1909 |
CLK |
|
Colwick |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
30/12/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CLK |
Colwick |
m/e |
03/12/1945 |
ALLOC |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
9w/e |
31/03/1946 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/12/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 39 |
|
|
06/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3039 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5498 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65498 |
|
|
30/12/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65498 |
|
|