Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3564 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16970 Week
» 69986 Month
» 189513 Year
» 3216366 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
23 |
m/e |
06/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3023 |
m/e |
11/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5482 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
65482 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
J5 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Order Number |
262 |
Works Number |
1268 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1910 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 02/11/1953 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 5 mths , 2 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
ALLOC |
CLX |
|
w/e |
14/01/1950 |
ALLOC |
34D |
Hitchin (GNR) |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
02/11/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 23 |
|
|
11/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3023 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5482 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65482 |
|
|
02/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
21/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
02/11/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65482 |
|
|