Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 69 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 30719 Week
» 129364 Month
» 332028 Year
» 3358881 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
313 |
|
12/1892 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3313 |
|
10/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4105 |
|
11/1946 |
British Railways |
64105 |
|
12/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt / N. Gresley |
Class |
J3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
592 |
To Service |
During 12/1892 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 21/01/1952 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 1 mth , 22 dys |
Information |
322 Series |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1892 |
37A |
|
Ardsley |
w/e |
22/09/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
21/01/1952 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
37A |
Ardsley |
w/e |
22/09/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
21/01/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
21/01/1952 |
Last Stirling goodes engine |
With the withdrawal of No. 64105 from traffic, the Stirling goods engine disappears from the Eastern Region of British Railways. Built in 1892 as No. 313 at Doncaster (Works No. 592), it had 17½ in. x 26 in. cylinders and 5 ft. 1 in. coupled wheels; the domeless boiler was 4 ft. 4 in. in diameter. The Great Northern classification was J6, power C. Under Ivatt's rule, it was later supplied with a domed boiler, then becoming Class J5, power B, then in October 1925, it received a 4 ft. 8 in. diameter boiler, with L.N.E.R. classification J3. Incidentally, it should be remarked that G.N. Class J5 was equivalent to L.N.E. Class J4. It first ran in L.N.E. livery as No 313 without any suffix N, but was soon renumbered 3313; it became No. 4105 on 17/11/1946, and 64105 on 2/6/1948; for many years it was at the London end of the line, working from Hitchin, but latterly was at Ardsley till withdrawn. |
SLS/195204 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1892 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 313 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 592 |
|
|
10/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3313 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4105 |
|
|
12/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64105 |
|
|
22/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) |
|
|
21/01/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64105 |
|
|