Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 905 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18708 Week
» 71724 Month
» 191251 Year
» 3218104 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
79 |
m/e |
10/1912 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5023 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
65023 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
J2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
269 |
Works Number |
1360 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 10/1912 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 09/11/1953 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 1 mth , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1953 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
m/e |
30/06/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
09/11/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/12/1953 |
Darlington Works |
North Road Works have completed 2MT 78010 an 78011 is ready for trials. Diesel shunters are out up to 13074, with the next four nearly completed. J2 65023 (fully lined out) and J5 65488, both from 38A, arrived here on 3rd December for cutting up. J77 68281 has also been cut up. |
SLS/195402 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 79 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1360 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5023 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65023 |
|
|
31/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
30/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
11/1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
09/11/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65023 |
|
|