Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1037 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18840 Week
» 71856 Month
» 191383 Year
» 3218236 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
5 |
m/e |
09/1908 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5004 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
65004 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
J1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
256 |
Works Number |
1205 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 09/1908 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 17/11/1952 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1952 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1908 |
NWE |
|
New England |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
38A |
|
Colwick |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
17/11/1952 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NWE |
New England |
on |
30/03/1947 |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/11/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 5 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1205 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5004 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65004 |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
11/1952 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
17/11/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65004 |
|
|