Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 384 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 2972 Week
» 32470 Month
» 369316 Year
» 1590881 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) E6010 11/1965
TOPS (Tops) 73104 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class 73
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 11/1965
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 09/07/1967
75D Stewarts Lane 4w/e 14/06/1968


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1965 To Service To service as E6010
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
   
09/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
14/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D)    
10/01/1972 Sightings While working the 12:24 Three Bridges - Chichester Class 8 Engineer's train, in conjunction with E6010, the train's brakes failed on the approach to Horsham station. The train ran into the back of the 12:02 Victoria - Portsmouth Harbour, consisting of 4-CIG 7362 and 4-BEP 7004. Considerable damage ensued but no-one lost their lives - the driver and secondman of E6027 taking shelter in the locomotives electrical compartment when they realised that a collision was inevitable.
On investigation, the brake cocks between the two locomotives had been switched off by the secondman at Three Bridges in trying to rectify a starting fault and he had forgotten to switch them back on, resulting in the driver having no control of the train brakes.
The MoT report can be seen here.
   
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 73104    

prev prev