Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 319 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 1568 Week
» 22010 Month
» 358856 Year
» 1580421 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) E6009 10/1965
TOPS (Tops) 73103 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class 73
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 10/1965
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 09/07/1967
75D Stewarts Lane 4w/e 14/06/1968


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1965 To Service To service as E6009
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
   
09/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
14/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D)    
27/10/1968 Sightings Hither Green depot: On shed RO 12/1968 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 73103    

prev prev