|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 23/02/1923 | 15/05/1923 | 82 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/11/1923 | 05/12/1923 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 27/02/1925 | 29/05/1925 | 92 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/06/1925 | 15/06/1925 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 30/04/1927 | 10/08/1927 | 103 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 12/04/1929 | 25/06/1929 | 75 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 23/09/1930 | 08/10/1930 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/05/1931 | 19/05/1931 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/11/1931 | 30/12/1931 | 54 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 21/06/1933 | 11/08/1933 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 2463 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/01/1936 | 16/04/1936 | 79 days | Rebuilding | |||
Darlington Works | 30/11/1937 | 28/01/1938 | 60 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 01/09/1938 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 22/04/1939 | 17/06/1939 | 57 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/06/1939 | 03/07/1939 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/05/1943 | 21/06/1943 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 116 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/06/1945 | 18/06/1945 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 23/03/1946 | 02/05/1946 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 2822 (Diagram 63C) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9881 |
||
Darlington Works | 08/05/1946 | 16/05/1946 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/09/1948 | 22/10/1948 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24713 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR 69881 |
||
Darlington Works | 17/04/1950 | 03/06/1950 | 48 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/06/1950 | 07/06/1950 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1951 | 18/05/1951 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 03/07/1951 | 11/08/1951 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 24714 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/02/1954 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 30/09/1954 | 04/11/1954 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | Positive lub. drive fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 05/06/1956 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 22/05/1958 | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
03/10/1948 | Darlington Works | The first new 'A.1,' No. 60130, was on trial W/E 24/9 and No. 60131 during W/E 2/10, both are nameless. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 517, 2342/71, 3344, 5027/28, 5852/83, 7300/07, 8141, E8723, 9392, 9881, 61638, 63099, 69841 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60804, 60980, 62729/75, 63333/91, 65666/92, 65752, 68302/99, 68675, 68744, 69868 and 'Austerity' 77050. No. 9089 was broken up W/E 24/9. | SLS/194811 |
02/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103. Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329. |
SLS/194901 |
31/10/1957 | Whitby MPD | In store are 62731/5/55/9/62/4/70/2/5 an 69864/5/81. | SLS/195711 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1921 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1502 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
23/02/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1923. Dep: 15/05/1923. | ||
30/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/11/1923. Dep: 05/12/1923. | ||
27/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1925. Dep: 29/05/1925. | ||
10/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/06/1925. Dep: 15/06/1925. | ||
30/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1927. Dep: 10/08/1927. | ||
12/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1929. Dep: 25/06/1929. | ||
23/09/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/09/1930. Dep: 08/10/1930. | ||
06/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/05/1931. Dep: 19/05/1931. | ||
07/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1931. Dep: 30/12/1931. | ||
21/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1933. Dep: 11/08/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2463 (Diagram 63A) |
||
19/06/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
29/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 29/01/1936. Dep: 16/04/1936. | ||
06/06/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA) | ||
30/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 30/11/1937. Dep: 28/01/1938. | ||
01/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 01/09/1938. | ||
22/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1939. Dep: 17/06/1939. | ||
22/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/06/1939. Dep: 03/07/1939. | ||
26/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
18/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1943. Dep: 21/06/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 116 (Diagram 63A) |
||
12/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA) | ||
11/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/06/1945. Dep: 18/06/1945. | ||
23/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1946. Dep: 02/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2822 (Diagram 63C) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9881 |
||
08/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/05/1946. Dep: 16/05/1946. | ||
27/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1948. Dep: 22/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24713 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR 69881 |
||
17/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 17/04/1950. Dep: 03/06/1950. | ||
05/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/06/1950. Dep: 07/06/1950. | ||
11/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/05/1951. Dep: 18/05/1951. | ||
03/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1951. Dep: 11/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24714 (Diagram 63B) |
||
25/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 25/02/1954. | ||
30/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/09/1954. Dep: 04/11/1954. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted |
||
09/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
29/05/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) | ||
05/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 05/06/1956. | ||
09/12/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) | ||
22/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 22/05/1958. | ||
02/06/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69881 from Scarborough (50E) | ||
07/1958 | Scrapped | Scrapped |