|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 11/02/1924 | 09/04/1924 | 59 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 06/02/1928 | 25/04/1928 | 80 days | General | Boiler number D294 (Diagram 63) |
||
Gateshead Works | 26/08/1929 | 06/09/1929 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 02/06/1930 | 25/07/1930 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 1D/689 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/04/1933 | 30/05/1933 | 34 days | General | Boiler number D1106 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/05/1935 | 23/08/1935 | 85 days | Rebuilding | |||
Darlington Works | 31/08/1937 | 19/10/1937 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 2822 (Diagram 63C) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1938 | 19/10/1938 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/10/1939 | 17/11/1939 | 32 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/12/1939 | 23/01/1940 | 33 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/05/1943 | 31/05/1943 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3369 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/03/1944 | 14/03/1944 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/02/1945 | 10/03/1945 | 32 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 19/12/1945 | 05/02/1946 | 49 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 16/06/1947 | 14/07/1947 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3362 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/07/1947 | 19/08/1947 | 27 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/09/1947 | 24/09/1947 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/10/1947 | 22/10/1947 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/04/1950 | 06/05/1950 | 33 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24729 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR 69861 |
||
Darlington Works | 08/05/1950 | 11/05/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/10/1951 | 08/12/1951 | 40 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/07/1954 | 14/08/1954 | 32 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 13/07/1956 | 29/08/1956 | 48 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 21/02/1958 | 01/04/1958 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 24747 (Diagram 63B) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1959 | Class A8 4-6-2T (Selby) | All the locomotives of this class were noted stored during May viz.-Borough Gardens 69852/6/8/70, Darlington 69887, Saltburn 69869, Selby 69861, Sunderland 69850/3/4/5/7/9/73/4/5/8/83, Thornaby 69860, West Hartlepool 69867/77/85, York 69886. | SLS/195907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2154 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
11/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1924. Dep: 09/04/1924. | ||
06/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1928. Dep: 25/04/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D294 (Diagram 63) |
||
26/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/08/1929. Dep: 06/09/1929. | ||
02/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1930. Dep: 25/07/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1D/689 (Diagram 63A) |
||
27/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1933. Dep: 30/05/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1106 (Diagram 63) |
||
31/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 31/05/1935. Dep: 23/08/1935. | ||
31/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1937. Dep: 19/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2822 (Diagram 63C) |
||
06/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/10/1938. Dep: 19/10/1938. | ||
18/01/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (SUN) | ||
17/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1939. Dep: 17/11/1939. | ||
22/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/12/1939. Dep: 23/01/1940. | ||
03/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1943. Dep: 31/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3369 (Diagram 63B) |
||
03/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/03/1944. Dep: 14/03/1944. | ||
07/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1945. Dep: 10/03/1945. | ||
19/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/12/1945. Dep: 05/02/1946. | ||
05/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Consett (CON) | ||
06/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9861 | ||
20/01/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (SUN) | ||
16/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1947. Dep: 14/07/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3362 (Diagram 63B) |
||
24/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/07/1947. Dep: 19/08/1947. | ||
16/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1947. Dep: 24/09/1947. | ||
01/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/10/1947. Dep: 22/10/1947. | ||
04/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1950. Dep: 06/05/1950. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24729 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR 69861 |
||
08/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/05/1950. Dep: 11/05/1950. | ||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (50G) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (50G) | ||
21/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
27/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
30/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1951. Dep: 08/12/1951. | ||
11/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (50G) | ||
17/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (50G) | ||
14/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/07/1954. Dep: 14/08/1954. | ||
03/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Malton (50F) | ||
13/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 13/07/1956. Dep: 29/08/1956. | ||
21/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1958. Dep: 01/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24747 (Diagram 63B) |
||
20/06/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69861 from Malton (50F) | ||
08/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |