Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 471 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19382 Week
» 84336 Month
» 287000 Year
» 3313853 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
281 |
m/e |
06/1882 |
North Eastern Railway (1882) |
1469 |
|
1883 |
North Eastern Railway (1885) |
166 |
|
02/1885 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8438 |
|
06/1946 |
British Railways |
68438 |
|
12/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
E. Fletcher |
Class |
G6 |
Company History |
NER/LNER/BR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 06/1882 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 24/02/1958 |
Service Life |
75 yrs, 8 mths , 24 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1882 |
50C |
|
Selby |
4w/e |
13/12/1952 |
51A |
|
Darlington |
5w/e |
18/06/1955 |
51E |
|
Stockton |
5w/e |
24/03/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
24/02/1958 |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/06/1951 |
Locomotives still not renumbered |
Although it is well over three years since the B.R. renumbering scheme was introduced, there were several classes with a small percentage still not renumbered (or at any rate not advised as done) at the end of June-Class B16 (69 survivors): Nos. 1419/23/33. Class D20 (28 survivors): Nos. 2360/72/95. Class Q5 (4 survivors): Nos. 3270, 3311/4/26. Of this large class, only 9 received B.R. numbers, the last to be done being 63313(2/12/48). None of the renumbered engines survives. Class Q6 is completely renumbered, No. 63342 having just been done. Class Q7 (15 engines): all done except. No. 3460. Class J21 (37 survivors): all done except 5025, 5117/22. Class J24 (6 survivors): not renumbered are 5623 (Scotland) and 5644. Class J25 (57 survivors): all done except 5663/7/86, 5727. (5699 has become 65699 but no trace of advice). Class J26 was completed on 19/5/51 when 65769 was done. Class J27 (115 engines): all done except 5890/4. Class G5 (106 survivors): all renumbered by 31/3/51. Class J71 (76 survivors): twelve to be done, Nos. 8230/1/9/47/9/51/4/72/98, 8304/11/6-an unusually large percentage not dealt with. Class J77 (38 survivors): Nos. 8405/38 not renumbered. Class J72 (113 engines): to be renumbered 8672/81, 8730(?), 8748. Class N10 (19 survivors): all done (?except 9095). |
SLS/195108 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1882 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 281 Built at Gateshead Works |
|
|
1883 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1469 |
|
|
02/1885 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 166 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8438 |
|
|
12/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68438 |
|
|
13/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (50C) |
|
|
18/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockton (51E) |
|
|
24/02/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68438 |
|
|