Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1747 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19550 Week
» 72566 Month
» 192093 Year
» 3218946 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1915 |
m/e |
06/1897 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7293 |
on |
03/02/1946 |
British Railways |
67293 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
G5 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
A218 |
To Service |
During 06/1897 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 04/04/1955 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 10 mths , 4 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
w/e |
05/02/1949 |
ALLOC |
50C |
Selby |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
ALLOC |
50B |
Neville Hill |
4w/e |
27/03/1954 |
ALLOC |
50F |
Malton |
4w/e |
22/05/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/04/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1897 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1915 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
05/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
03/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7293 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Whitby (WBY) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67293 |
|
|
05/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) |
|
|
07/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (50C) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (50C) |
|
|
20/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) |
|
|
22/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Malton (50F) |
|
|
04/04/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67293 |
|
|