Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1332 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19135 Week
» 72151 Month
» 191678 Year
» 3218531 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1888 |
m/e |
12/1896 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7286 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
67286 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
G5 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
A209 |
To Service |
During 12/1896 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 08/10/1956 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 10 mths , 8 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
MAL |
Malton |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
ALLOC |
SBK |
Starbeck |
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
ALLOC |
SEL |
Selby |
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
08/10/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
09/1941 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1896 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1888 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
07/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Malton (MAL) |
|
|
09/1941 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7286 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Starbeck (SBK) |
|
|
21/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Malton (MAL) |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) |
|
|
18/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (SEL) |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67286 |
|
|
08/10/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67286 |
|
|