Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1292 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19095 Week
» 72111 Month
» 191638 Year
» 3218491 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1882 |
m/e |
11/1896 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7279 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
67279 |
w/e |
30/12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
G5 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
A209 |
To Service |
During 11/1896 |
Withdrawal |
During 11/1956 |
Service Life |
60 yrs |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
02/1939 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1896 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1882 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
09/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
02/1939 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7279 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB) |
|
|
08/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
30/12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67279 |
|
|
28/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
18/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
11/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67279 |
|
|