Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 1923 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19726 Week
» 72742 Month
» 192269 Year
» 3219122 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1713 |
m/e |
06/1896 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7271 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
British Railways |
67271 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
G5 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
A209 |
To Service |
During 06/1896 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/02/1955 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 8 mths , 7 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1896 |
WHL |
|
West Hartlepool |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
51E |
|
Stockton |
5w/e |
24/07/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
07/02/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51E |
Stockton |
4w/e |
14/08/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
07/02/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1896 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1713 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
12/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
01/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7271 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - West Hartlepool (WHL) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67271 |
|
|
24/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockton (51E) |
|
|
07/02/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67271 |
|
|