Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1567 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19370 Week
» 72386 Month
» 191913 Year
» 3218766 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1096 |
m/e |
05/1894 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7240 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
British Railways |
67240 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
G5 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
A177 |
To Service |
During 05/1894 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 16/04/1956 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 11 mths , 17 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1894 |
NEV |
|
Neville Hill |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
50G |
|
Whitby |
4w/e |
25/07/1953 |
50F |
|
Malton |
5w/e |
17/12/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/04/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
50G |
Whitby |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
ALLOC |
50F |
Malton |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/04/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1894 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1096 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
07/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
20/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7240 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neville Hill (NEV) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67240 |
|
|
25/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Whitby (50G) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Malton (50F) |
|
|
16/04/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67240 |
|
|