Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 3775 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17181 Week
» 70197 Month
» 189724 Year
» 3216577 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E6007 |
13/10/1965 |
TOPS (Tops) |
73100 |
01/1974 |
TOPS (Tops) |
73101 |
01/1974 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
03/12/1980 |
Brighton Evening Argus |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/10/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E6007 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
|
|
09/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
14/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D) |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 73100 |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 73101 |
|
|
03/12/1980 |
Naming |
Named 'Brighton Evening Argus' by Mrs D Williams, wife of the editor of the eponymous newspaper at Brighton station |
|
|