Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2285 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20088 Week
» 73104 Month
» 192631 Year
» 3219484 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
170 |
m/e |
08/1908 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7170 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7215 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
67215 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
F4 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
S64 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 08/1908 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 19/09/1955 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 1 mth , 19 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
COL |
Colchester |
w/e |
10/12/1949 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
w/e |
17/11/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/09/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 170 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7170 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7215 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67215 |
|
|
30/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (COL) |
|
|
10/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (COL) |
|
|
17/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
19/09/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67215 |
|
|