Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 780 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14186 Week
» 67202 Month
» 186729 Year
» 3213582 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
214 |
m/e |
09/1907 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7214 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7162 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
67162 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
F4 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
G63 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 09/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 15/08/1955 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 11 mths , 15 dys |
Information |
Carried the letter C during secondment to the War Department instead of it's usual number |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1907 |
WD |
|
(Used for coastal defence at Westerfield & Canterbury) |
m/e |
06/1940 |
91E |
|
To Eastern Region |
m/e |
07/1943 |
YB |
|
Yarmouth Beach |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
MEL |
|
|
on |
25/01/1948 |
32E |
|
Yarmouth Vauxhall |
4w/e |
20/10/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
15/08/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1940 |
Wartime Armour Plating fitted |
10/1943 |
Wartime Armour Plating removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/09/1947 |
Stratford Works |
Commemoration plates are being fitted to certain engines of Class 'F4' which were used on war service. Plates noted on Nose 7152 and 7162 read as follows:-'During the war of 1939-1945 this locomotive was armoured and hauled defence trains on the coast lines.' The frames of Claud Hamilton still exist in a siding near the Paint Shop. |
SLS/194710 |
25/09/1947 |
Stratford Works |
The following withdrawn locos. were noted in the vicinity of the stripping shop on 25/9: 'F3' 7118/21/29/38/45; 'B12/3' 1522; 'D16/3' 2500; 'J15' 5358 an 5403 (all stripped), whilst 7125 an 7148 were intact. Other locos. stripped were: 'J15' 5402/54; 'D16' 2535; 'J17' 5541/71. In the stripping shop were: 'E4' 2784; 'J15' 5472; 'J19/2' 4675 and 'J17' 5549. In the Paint shop were the 'Coffee Pot' 'Y5' 8081 and W.D. 77416. A curious sight was the crane tank shed filled by two W.D.'s 77119 an 77312 (the latter with a 15A shed plate). In the fields behind the New Works were 'F3' 7146; 'J70' 8225; 'H2' 7512; 'D16' 2591; 'B12' 1544 and 'J39' 4841, all awaiting works. W.D. 77476 was in the New Works, and W.D.'s 77302 and 77107 were in the shed yard. 'D16' 2584; 'J20' 4677/93; 'J39' 4708/61, 'J69' 8574/8632; 'F6' 7230 and 'F4' 7162 were all noted newly painted ex-works. 7162 was fitted with a tablet-catcher. |
SLS/194711 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 214 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7214 |
|
|
06/1940 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
06/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: Wartime Armour Plating fitted |
|
|
07/1943 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
10/1943 |
Modification |
Modification: Wartime Armour Plating removed |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7162 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Yarmouth Beach (YB) |
|
|
25/01/1948 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67162 |
|
|
20/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Vauxhall (32E) |
|
|
15/08/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67162 |
|
|