Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 783 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18586 Week
» 71602 Month
» 191129 Year
» 3217982 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1254 |
m/e |
06/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7411 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7794 |
m/e |
10/1942 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2796 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
62795 |
m/e |
12/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
E4 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
S50 |
To Service |
During 06/1902 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 07/03/1955 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 9 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/03/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1254 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7411 |
|
|
01/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby Stephen (KBY) |
|
|
10/1942 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7794 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2796 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
18/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
22/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
12/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62795 |
|
|
07/03/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62795 |
|
|
05/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|