Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 343 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18146 Week
» 71162 Month
» 190689 Year
» 3217542 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7793 |
|
Not applied |
Great Eastern Railway |
1252 |
m/e |
06/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7409 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2794 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
62794 |
m/e |
04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
E4 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
S50 |
To Service |
During 06/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 22/08/1955 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 2 mths , 22 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31E |
Bury St Edmunds |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/08/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/07/1949 |
Cambridge MPD |
On 10/7, the following were in store at Cambridge, in the goods yard behind the shed: 'C.12' No. 7354; 'E.4' No. 2785; 'F.3' No. 7124; 'F.4' Nos. 7160 an 7187. Four other 'E.4's' were in traffic, or on the shed, viz: Nos. 2783, 62788/91 an 2794. |
SLS/194908 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
0000 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7793 but not taken up |
|
|
06/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1252 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7409 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2794 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62794 |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
22/08/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62794 |
|
|