Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1002 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18805 Week
» 71821 Month
» 191348 Year
» 3218201 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7798 |
|
Not applied |
Great Eastern Railway |
463 |
m/e |
11/1892 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7463 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2781 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
62781 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
E4 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
A31 |
To Service |
During 11/1892 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 02/01/1956 |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 2 mths , 2 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CAM |
Cambridge |
w/e |
17/12/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/01/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
0000 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7798 but not taken up |
|
|
11/1892 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 463 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7463 |
|
|
01/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barnard Castle (Dar) |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2781 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62781 |
|
|
30/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
17/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
02/01/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62781 |
|
|