Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3254 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16660 Week
» 69676 Month
» 189203 Year
» 3216056 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
427 |
m/e |
04/1891 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7427 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7797 |
m/e |
01/1943 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2780 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
British Railways |
62780 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
E4 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
Y26 |
To Service |
During 04/1891 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 26/09/1955 |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 5 mths , 26 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
4w/e |
26/03/1949 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
w/e |
29/09/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
26/09/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1891 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 427 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7427 |
|
|
01/1943 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7797 |
|
|
01/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2780 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
26/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62780 |
|
|
29/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
20/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
26/09/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62780 |
|
|