Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 3521 Today
» 5153 Yesterday
» 8674 Week
» 143490 Month
» 346154 Year
» 3373007 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
238 |
|
17/08/1934 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2757 |
|
05/1946 |
British Railways |
62757 |
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
17/08/1934 |
THE BURTON |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1958 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
17/08/1934 |
HLB |
|
Hull Botanic Gardens |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
10/12/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/12/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/08/1934 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 238, name: THE BURTON Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1588 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2757 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB) |
|
|
28/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62757 |
|
|
10/12/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62757 |
|
|
02/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|