Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3094 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16500 Week
» 69516 Month
» 189043 Year
» 3215896 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
226 |
|
23/07/1934 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2755 |
|
06/1946 |
British Railways |
62755 |
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
SCA |
Scarborough |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
ALLOC |
SBK |
Starbeck |
w/e |
03/12/1949 |
ALLOC |
50B |
Neville Hill |
4w/e |
23/06/1956 |
ALLOC |
50C |
Selby |
4w/e |
13/10/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
12/11/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1957 |
Whitby MPD |
In store are 62731/5/55/9/62/4/70/2/5 an 69864/5/81. |
SLS/195711 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/07/1934 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 226, name: THE BILSDALE Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1586 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2755 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - York (North) (YK) |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA) |
|
|
03/09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62755 |
|
|
12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) |
|
|
03/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) |
|
|
20/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (50C) |
|
|
12/11/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62755 |
|
|
01/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|