Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 485 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19396 Week
» 84350 Month
» 287014 Year
» 3313867 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
322 |
|
10/07/1928 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2722 |
|
11/1946 |
British Railways |
62722 |
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
on |
14/06/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
20/10/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1932 |
Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/07/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 322, name: HUNTINGDONSHIRE Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1401 |
|
|
07/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2722 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB) |
|
|
29/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62722 |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
20/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62722 |
|
|
12/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|