Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1404 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 32054 Week
» 130699 Month
» 333363 Year
» 3360216 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
866 |
m/e |
11/1909 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9866 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2457 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
62457 |
w/e |
03/04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
D33 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram 78 (Round Top firebox) | Engine Brakes | Steam | Train Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 11/1909 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 06/06/1952 |
Service Life |
42 yrs, 7 mths , 6 dys |
Information |
E |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1953 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1936 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
04/1936 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
04/1936 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1909 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 866 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
12/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9866 |
|
|
04/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2457 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Perth (LNER) (PTH) |
|
|
03/04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62457 |
|
|
04/03/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
07/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
21/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
06/06/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62457 |
|
|
02/1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|