Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1842 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15248 Week
» 68264 Month
» 187791 Year
» 3214644 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
768 |
m/e |
11/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9768 |
m/e |
06/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2072 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways (1st) |
62072 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
British Railways (2nd) |
62283 |
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
D31 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 11/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 28/02/1951 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1899 |
BGT |
|
Bathgate |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
28/02/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BGT |
Bathgate |
w/e |
28/12/1946 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
28/02/1951 |
WDN |
64F |
Bathgate |
on |
28/02/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
16/10/1948 |
Cowlairs Works |
Class 'D.31' No. 2060 CAR was ex Works during W/E 16/10, having been re-numbered 62060, painted black and lined; a smokebox numberplate had also been fitted. It is interesting to note that No. 62060 is the first of the class to be painted in the latest style, whilst of the other three survivors of this class two have already been re-numbered into British Railways stock -Nos. 62065 KEI and 62072 BGT-leaving only No. 2059 CAR as L.N.E.R. No. 57320 has been repaired at Cowlairs-the first ex L.M.S. engine to be dealt with here-and has appeared with Polmadie on the buffer beam, in true L.N.E.R. style; it is not known whether the former L.M.S. 27A shed plate is still on the smokebox door. |
SLS/194812 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1899 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 768 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
06/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9768 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2072 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bathgate (BGT) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62072 |
|
|
18/06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62283 |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62283 |
|
|