Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1247 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 27281 Week
» 125926 Month
» 328590 Year
» 3355443 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
501 |
m/e |
12/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9501 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2442 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
62442 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
D30 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram 78 (Round Top firebox) | Reverser | Screw Reverse fitted | Engine Brakes | Vacuum | Train Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 12/1920 |
Withdrawal |
During 06/1958 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1920 |
THJ |
|
Thornton Junction |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
06/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
26/06/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1936 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
03/1936 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
07/02/1948 |
Cowlairs Works |
No engines have as yet (7/2) appeared from Cowlairs Works lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' or painted in any new style; the same remarks also apply to Q.P. Works. Further locomotives ex Cowlairs Works painted green are: Nos. 1787-89, 2679/80, while Nos. 2440/2, 9189, an 9215 were just ex Works, the latter having acquired the vacuum brake |
SLS/194803 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1920 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 501, name: SIMON GLOVER Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
01/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9501 |
|
|
03/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2442 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ) |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62442 |
|
|
06/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62442 |
|
|
02/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|