|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1958 | Stratford Works (Waiting Wks.) | Old Works-61003 (30F), 43107 (31D), 61066 (31A), 61089 (30A), 61136 (14D), 61160 (32B), 61164 (30A), 61254 (32B), 61299 (40E), 61361 (30E), 61372 (30A), 61632 (31A), 64677 (30A), 64965 (33A), 65561 (32B), 69695-Wdn., 80079 (33B). Diesel Shop-12064 (14A), 15214 (75C), D208 (34B), D2208 (30A), D2210 (32A), D2214 (32A), D3221 (75C), D3444 (34A), D3460 (73C), D3476 (34C), D5514 (30A), D8407 (30A). Waiting Wks.-61336 (30E), 61573 (31E), 61576 (31E), 62571 (40A), 62582 (31A), 62610 (31C), 64651 (30E), 64672 (31B), 64688 (31A), 68625 (32D), 68630 (30A), 68636 (30A), 69610 (30A), 69616 (31A), 69703 (30A), 69717 (30A), Departmental 36. Stripping-62614, 69608/41. Foundry-65568, 65587, 69624. On Shed Ex Wks.-D2573 (32G), D3217 (75A). Waiting Cut Up-61547/61/4, 62518/34/6/43/5/66/72/88/615, 62788, 64645, 65390/438/41/4, 65504/74, 68529/41/616/8/32, 68653/7/9/62/6, 69628. | SLS/195902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1911 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1799 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8799 | ||
02/1929 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
02/1934 | Modification | Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted | ||
02/1934 | Modification | Modification: GNR style Chimney fitted | ||
02/1940 | Modification | Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted | ||
02/1940 | Modification | Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted | ||
1942 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 7669 but not taken up | ||
11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2610 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
12/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 62610 | ||
25/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G) | ||
22/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G) | ||
01/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
12/11/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
19/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) | ||
01/01/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 62610 from Kings Lynn (31C) | ||
02/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |