Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1561 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14967 Week
» 67983 Month
» 187510 Year
» 3214363 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1792 |
m/e |
03/1911 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8792 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7662 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2603 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
62603 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
D15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
E69 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 03/1911 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 03/09/1951 off Cambridge (31A) |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 6 mths , 5 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
03/09/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1914 |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
03/1928 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
03/1928 |
Diagram 26 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
09/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
25/02/1946 |
Detail Alterations |
B2 1671 has returned to Cambridge painted green, for Royal workings. 8783, one of the former Cambridge 'Royal' Clauds, has also been repainted green, and has been transferred to King's Lynn for working the Royal Train between there and Wolferton. Previously a black Lynn Claud, usually 8792, has been used on the Lynn-Wolferton part of the run. it is rumoured that a scheme is being prepared for altering the layout at King's Lynn by the completion of a triangle, which would enable Royal and other trains for the Hunstanton line to run through Lynn without reversing. 1671 is to be named 'Royal Sovereign,' a more appropriate name for its present duties than 'Manchester City.' N.B. locos recently fitted with graduated steam brake and vacuum in place of Westinghouse include 9380 an 9772. J38 1421/44 have had the steam reverse replaced by screw. |
SLS/194604 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1911 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1792 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1914 |
Modification |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8792 |
|
|
03/1928 |
Modification |
Diagram 26 boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
09/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7662 but not taken up |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2603 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62603 |
|
|
23/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
03/09/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62603 from Cambridge (31A) |
|
|