Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1857 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15900 Week
» 80854 Month
» 283518 Year
» 3310371 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1830 |
m/e |
03/1908 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8830 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7700 |
y/e |
Not applied |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2561 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
62561 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
D15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
A64 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 03/1908 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 10/02/1958 off Melton Constable (32G) |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 11 mths , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1925 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
01/1925 |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
05/1929 |
Extended Smokebox fitted |
05/1936 |
GNR style Chimney fitted |
03/1940 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
03/1940 |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1830 Built at Stratford Works Diagram 28 boiler fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8830 |
|
|
01/1925 |
Modification |
Diagram 27Sup boiler fitted |
|
|
01/1925 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
05/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended Smokebox fitted |
|
|
05/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: GNR style Chimney fitted |
|
|
03/1940 |
Modification |
Diagram 28A (1936) boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 28A (1936) boiler Fitted |
|
|
1942 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7700 but not taken up |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2561 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Yarmouth Beach (YB) |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62561 |
|
|
26/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (YB) |
|
|
20/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
22/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G) |
|
|
10/02/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62561 from Melton Constable (32G) |
|
|
04/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|