Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 526 Today
» 1125 Yesterday
» 3892 Week
» 526 Month
» 337372 Year
» 1558937 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) E6004 06/07/1962
TOPS (Tops) 73004 01/01/1973

Names Carried
Date From Name
19/09/1987 The Bluebell Railway

Locomotive Specifics
Class 73
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service 06/07/1962
Cut Up 02/2004
Cut At Harry Needle Railroad Company at Kingsbury
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1962 To Service To service as E6004
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
27/10/1968 Sightings Hither Green depot: On shed RO 12/1968 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 73004    
19/09/1987 Naming Named 'The Bluebell Railway' by Johnny Morris, vice president of the Bluebell Railway Preservatiion Society at East Grinstead station    
02/2004 Scrapped Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury    

prev prev