Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1438 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19241 Week
» 72257 Month
» 191784 Year
» 3218637 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
309 |
m/e |
08/1913 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9309 |
m/e |
02/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7474 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
British Railways |
67474 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
C15 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Yorkshire Engine Company |
Order Number |
E183 |
Works Number |
1088 |
To Service |
During 08/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 12/04/1960 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 8 mths , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1913 |
CAR |
|
Carlisle Canal |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
65A |
|
Eastfield |
4w/e |
25/09/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
12/04/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65A |
Eastfield |
4w/e |
04/09/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
12/04/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1954 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1913 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 309 Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 1088 |
|
|
02/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9309 |
|
|
03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7474 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Canal (CAR) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67474 |
|
|
09/1954 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
25/09/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
12/04/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67474 |
|
|
05/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|