Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3244 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16650 Week
» 69666 Month
» 189193 Year
» 3216046 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
193 |
m/e |
09/1903 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5193 |
m/e |
11/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7418 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
67418 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
C13 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 09/1903 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 27/12/1958 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 3 mths , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1903 |
NEA |
|
Neasden |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
27/12/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
14D |
Neasden |
on |
01/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
14D |
Neasden |
on |
23/02/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
27/12/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1931 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
08/1933 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/04/1957 |
London Transport |
There are now two former G.W.R. 0-6-0PT at Neasden Metropolitan shed, sL90 and sL91. Both are fully lined out in L.T. steam engine livery. Ex Met. 0-6-2T sL51 has been outside the shed for some weeks in woebegone condition and appears to be awaiting scrapping. On 9th May, ex G.C.R. 4-4-2T 67418 was outside the Met. shed. |
SLS/195706 |
27/12/1958 |
Chesham Branch |
Following the withdrawal of Neasden's last GC 4-4-2T, 67416, the Chesham branch. is being worked by Ivatt 2-6-2Ts made redundant at Bedford-41270/2, 41329. 67416/8/20 had been engaged exclusively on this branch which is worked by push/pull sets. |
SLS/195902 |
27/12/1958 |
Woodford Halse MPD |
This shed now has 4 diesel shunters (D3066-9); Class 5s 45222/37 (officially transferred from Huddersfield-Northampton) have been working on passenger turns. 73157 (14D) failed here on 31st December and on same day GC 4-4-2T 67418 passed through en route Gorton ex the Chesham branch. |
SLS/195902 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 193 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
11/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5193 |
|
|
05/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
08/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7418 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neasden (NEA) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67418 |
|
|
27/12/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67418 |
|
|
02/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|