Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 781 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14187 Week
» 67203 Month
» 186730 Year
» 3213583 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
171 |
m/e |
05/1903 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5171 |
m/e |
06/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7412 |
on |
17/03/1946 |
British Railways |
67412 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
C13 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 05/1903 |
Withdrawal |
During 05/1954 |
Service Life |
51 yrs |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1954 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1903 |
GOR |
|
Gorton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
6E |
|
Wrexham Rhosddu |
5w/e |
03/01/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
05/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1926 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
24/08/1954 |
Doncaster Works (scrap roads) |
On 24/8/54 a visit to the new erecting shop at Doncaster Works revealed the first two (80106-7) of the batch of ten BR standard 2-6-4Ts in early stages of construction and the frames set up for the third (80108). Among engines in the scrap roads, either being cut up or awaiting decision, were 67369 (C12), 67412 (C13), 65002 (J1), 65020 (J2), 65493/95 (J5), 68854/59 (J52), and 69437/82 (N1). A2/1 60507 (64B) was resplendent outside the paint 'shop after general repair. |
SLS/195410 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 171 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
06/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
06/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5171 |
|
|
17/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7412 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67412 |
|
|
03/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E) |
|
|
05/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67412 |
|
|
07/1954 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|