Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2108 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19911 Week
» 72927 Month
» 192454 Year
» 3219307 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
1085 |
m/e |
10/1905 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6085 |
m/e |
01/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2909 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
62909 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1950 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1905 |
LIN |
|
Lincoln |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
BOS |
|
Boston |
w/e |
06/03/1948 |
IMM |
|
Immingham |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
17/11/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
IMM |
Immingham |
on |
05/05/1947 |
ALLOC |
LIN |
Lincoln |
on |
14/07/1947 |
ALLOC |
BOS |
Boston |
w/e |
06/03/1948 |
ALLOC |
IMM |
Immingham |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/11/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 1085 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 16935 |
|
|
01/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6085 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2909 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lincoln (LIN) |
|
|
06/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (BOS) |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 62909 but not taken up |
|
|
11/1950 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
17/11/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2909 |
|
|