08/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1454 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1278 |
|
|
1912 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: ?/10/1912. |
|
|
1918 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1918. Dep: ?/09/1918. |
|
|
01/05/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1922. Dep: 15/07/1922. |
|
|
07/02/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1924. Dep: 03/05/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4454
|
|
|
18/12/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1925. Dep: 09/04/1926. |
|
|
01/12/1927 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1927. Dep: 11/05/1928. |
|
|
31/12/1929 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1929. Dep: 01/02/1930. |
|
|
06/02/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/02/1930. Dep: 08/03/1930. |
|
|
05/03/1932 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1932. Dep: 23/04/1932. |
|
|
25/02/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/02/1933. Dep: 04/03/1933. |
|
|
31/03/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1934. Dep: 12/05/1934. |
|
|
15/02/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1936. Dep: 14/03/1936. |
|
|
17/08/1937 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) |
|
|
12/10/1937 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
19/03/1938 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1938. Dep: 16/04/1938. |
|
|
15/06/1940 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1940. Dep: 13/07/1940. |
|
|
05/12/1942 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1942. Dep: 09/01/1943. |
|
|
02/12/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1944. Dep: 13/01/1945. |
|
|
12/06/1946 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 12/06/1946. Dep: 12/06/1946. Work undertaken: At Plant
|
|
|
07/07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2884 |
|
|
17/08/1946 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 17/08/1946. Dep: 17/08/1946. |
|
|
07/09/1946 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2884 |
|
|