|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1916 | 12/1916 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 02/11/1921 | 18/03/1922 | 137 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/11/1923 | 26/01/1924 | 87 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1446N |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/02/1926 | 26/07/1926 | 158 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4446 |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/12/1926 | 31/12/1926 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/04/1928 | 18/07/1928 | 89 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/08/1930 | 27/09/1930 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/09/1932 | 15/10/1932 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/10/1934 | 24/11/1934 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1936 | 12/12/1936 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/08/1939 | 23/09/1939 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/07/1942 | 22/08/1942 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/12/1944 | 17/02/1945 | 57 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/12/1947 | 15/12/1947 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1908 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1446 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1195 |
||
1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: ?/12/1916. | ||
02/11/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1921. Dep: 18/03/1922. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted |
||
01/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1923. Dep: 26/01/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1446N |
||
19/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1926. Dep: 26/07/1926. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4446 |
||
02/12/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/12/1926. Dep: 31/12/1926. | ||
21/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1928. Dep: 18/07/1928. | ||
16/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1930. Dep: 27/09/1930. | ||
17/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1932. Dep: 15/10/1932. | ||
27/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1934. Dep: 24/11/1934. | ||
07/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1936. Dep: 12/12/1936. | ||
30/11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
05/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1939. Dep: 23/09/1939. | ||
21/03/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
17/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1942. Dep: 22/08/1942. | ||
23/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1944. Dep: 17/02/1945. | ||
14/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2876 | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
01/02/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
15/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 15/12/1947. Dep: 15/12/1947. | ||
03/01/1948 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2876 |