Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 680 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31330 Week
» 129975 Month
» 332639 Year
» 3359492 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1445 |
|
05/1908 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4445 |
|
30/08/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2875 |
|
18/08/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
255 |
Works Number |
1194 |
To Service |
During 05/1908 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 22/01/1949 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 8 mths , 23 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1445 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1194 |
|
|
1918 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1918. Dep: ?/04/1918. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
20/09/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1922. Dep: 30/12/1922. |
|
|
20/06/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1924. Dep: 30/08/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4445
|
|
|
29/04/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1926. Dep: 03/11/1926. |
|
|
16/08/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1928. Dep: 31/10/1928. |
|
|
27/07/1929 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/07/1929. Dep: 17/08/1929. |
|
|
09/08/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1930. Dep: 27/09/1930. |
|
|
08/10/1932 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1932. Dep: 12/11/1932. |
|
|
13/10/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1934. Dep: 10/11/1934. |
|
|
14/11/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1936. Dep: 26/12/1936. |
|
|
15/07/1939 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1939. Dep: 26/08/1939. |
|
|
31/01/1942 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1942. Dep: 07/03/1942. |
|
|
15/02/1943 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) |
|
|
23/05/1943 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
28/10/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1944. Dep: 02/12/1944. |
|
|
22/09/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/09/1945. Dep: 06/10/1945. |
|
|
09/12/1945 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) |
|
|
18/08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2875 |
|
|
05/01/1949 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 05/01/1949. Dep: 05/01/1949. |
|
|
22/01/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2875 |
|
|