04/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1444 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1192 |
|
|
1914 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: ?/08/1914. |
|
|
1917 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: ?/05/1917. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
08/12/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1922. Dep: 02/04/1923. |
|
|
03/04/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1925. Dep: 18/07/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4444
|
|
|
25/04/1927 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1927. Dep: 13/08/1927. |
|
|
09/01/1928 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
12/03/1928 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
25/05/1929 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1929. Dep: 13/07/1929. |
|
|
28/03/1931 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1931. Dep: 02/05/1931. |
|
|
17/10/1931 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/10/1931. Dep: 14/11/1931. |
|
|
28/01/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1933. Dep: 04/03/1933. |
|
|
06/10/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1934. Dep: 03/11/1934. |
|
|
10/10/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1936. Dep: 21/11/1936. |
|
|
12/08/1939 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1939. Dep: 30/09/1939. |
|
|
27/04/1941 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) |
|
|
20/06/1942 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1942. Dep: 25/07/1942. |
|
|
23/09/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1944. Dep: 21/10/1944. |
|
|
13/01/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/01/1945. Dep: 27/01/1945. |
|
|
15/09/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 15/09/1945. Dep: 15/09/1945. |
|
|
02/10/1945 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4444 |
|
|
1946 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 2874 but not taken up |
|
|