Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 4081 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34731 Week
» 133376 Month
» 336040 Year
» 3362893 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1410 |
|
08/1905 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4410 |
|
24/05/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2840 |
|
21/09/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
241 |
Works Number |
1086 |
To Service |
During 08/1905 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 29/04/1947 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 8 mths , 29 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1905 |
KX |
|
Kings Cross |
on |
26/04/1945 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
29/04/1947 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
KX |
Kings Cross |
on |
29/04/1947 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1410 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1086 |
|
|
1914 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: ?/03/1914. |
|
|
1917 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: ?/07/1917. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
28/10/1921 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1921. Dep: 15/04/1922. |
|
|
04/02/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1924. Dep: 24/05/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4410
|
|
|
07/06/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1926. Dep: 04/09/1926. |
|
|
17/01/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1928. Dep: 05/04/1928. |
|
|
07/12/1929 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1929. Dep: 18/01/1930. |
|
|
31/10/1931 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1931. Dep: 12/12/1931. |
|
|
25/11/1933 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1933. Dep: 06/01/1934. |
|
|
18/08/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1934. Dep: 29/09/1934. |
|
|
25/04/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1936. Dep: 06/06/1936. |
|
|
23/04/1938 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1938. Dep: 14/05/1938. |
|
|
04/05/1940 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1940. Dep: 15/06/1940. |
|
|
29/08/1942 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1942. Dep: 26/09/1942. |
|
|
14/10/1944 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1944. Dep: 04/11/1944. |
|
|
26/04/1945 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
21/09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2840 |
|
|
23/02/1947 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 23/02/1947. Dep: 23/02/1947. |
|
|
29/04/1947 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2840 |
|
|