Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3118 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 29152 Week
» 127797 Month
» 330461 Year
» 3357314 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
277 |
|
05/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3277 |
|
16/05/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2806 |
|
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
C1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
236 |
Works Number |
1035 |
To Service |
During 05/1904 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 31/01/1945 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 277 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1035 |
|
|
1909 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1909. Dep: ?/04/1909. |
|
|
1919 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: ?/11/1919. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted
|
|
|
12/06/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1923. Dep: 01/09/1923. |
|
|
17/02/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1925. Dep: 16/05/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3277
|
|
|
04/06/1925 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) |
|
|
09/02/1927 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1927. Dep: 04/06/1927. |
|
|
16/02/1929 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1929. Dep: 13/04/1929. |
|
|
25/10/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1930. Dep: 29/11/1930. |
|
|
02/07/1932 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1932. Dep: 27/08/1932. |
|
|
19/09/1932 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
27/10/1934 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1934. Dep: 24/11/1934. |
|
|
14/11/1936 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1936. Dep: 12/12/1936. |
|
|
10/12/1938 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1938. Dep: 14/01/1939. |
|
|
24/09/1940 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/09/1940. Dep: 28/09/1940. |
|
|
01/02/1941 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1941. Dep: 08/03/1941. |
|
|
22/05/1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1943. Dep: 10/07/1943. |
|
|
25/06/1944 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
13/01/1945 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 13/01/1945. Dep: 13/01/1945. |
|
|
31/01/1945 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3277 |
|
|
1946 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 2806 but not taken up |
|
|