|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1910 | 03/1910 | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 1918 | 10/1918 | General | Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Doncaster Works | 10/12/1920 | 30/04/1921 | 142 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/08/1923 | 06/10/1923 | 66 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 276N |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/04/1925 | 08/08/1925 | 116 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/12/1925 | 26/12/1925 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/05/1927 | 06/08/1927 | 74 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/10/1928 | 14/12/1928 | 60 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1930 | 29/03/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/11/1930 | 06/12/1930 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/04/1932 | 14/05/1932 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/10/1933 | 16/12/1933 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/06/1934 | 01/09/1934 | 64 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/02/1936 | 28/03/1936 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/08/1937 | 02/10/1937 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/01/1939 | 25/02/1939 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1940 | 24/02/1940 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/05/1941 | 14/06/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/10/1942 | 05/12/1942 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/11/1944 | 09/12/1944 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/12/1945 | 15/12/1945 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
19/08/1947 | Darlington Works | The following newly painted locos. were observed on shed here on 19/8: W.D. Nos. 77129, 77209, 77431, 78514 and 79204, together with 'D49' 2708 THJ. On the same day the following newly painted locos. were seen in the Works' yard: 'D49' 2738; 'Q5' 3287; 'J21' 5108; 'J24' 5604; 'J25' 5689 and ex H. & B. 'N13' 9113; whilst the following were stripped but not marked for scrapping: 'J24' 5636; 'J25' 5648/71/81/99, 5701; 'Q5' 3276/78/83/93. Further locos. also stripped were: 'D49' 2727; 'J26' 5731/60/73/77; 'Ql' 9931; W.D. Nos. 77365 (ex N.S. No. 4364) and 77162 (ex N.S. No. 4482). 'T1' 9919, 9921 and 'J77' 8429 TWD were in the Erecting Shop, whilst the frames for the new Class 'Bl' locos. were laid up to No. 1036. 'A2' 507 was in the Works yard but has since been noted in traffic while 'A2' 511 was in Stooperdale boiler yard. 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 77080 (ex N.S. No. 4330), 77225, 77306 and 77456 were stored in the Paint Shop with the cab fittings removed. The electric locos. that were previously stored had been removed. The scrap yard contained 'J21' 5053 which was almost completely cut up. The scrapping of 'Cl' No. 2845 had been commenced and outside the Works yard Nos. 2825, 2855 and 2879 were awaiting their doom. Owing to the large number of 'CI's' now being withdrawn it is quite impossible for them all to be broken up at Doncaster and consequently a number of these engines are being dealt with at Darlington. | SLS/194710 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1904 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 276 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1034 |
||
1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: ?/03/1910. | ||
1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1918. Dep: ?/10/1918. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted |
||
10/12/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1920. Dep: 30/04/1921. | ||
02/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1923. Dep: 06/10/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 276N |
||
16/02/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3276 | ||
15/04/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1925. Dep: 08/08/1925. | ||
07/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/12/1925. Dep: 26/12/1925. | ||
25/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1927. Dep: 06/08/1927. | ||
04/07/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
14/07/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
16/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1928. Dep: 14/12/1928. | ||
17/12/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
22/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1930. Dep: 29/03/1930. | ||
08/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/11/1930. Dep: 06/12/1930. | ||
02/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1932. Dep: 14/05/1932. | ||
07/11/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
28/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1933. Dep: 16/12/1933. | ||
30/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1934. Dep: 01/09/1934. | ||
15/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1936. Dep: 28/03/1936. | ||
21/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1937. Dep: 02/10/1937. | ||
28/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1939. Dep: 25/02/1939. | ||
06/08/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
06/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/02/1940. Dep: 24/02/1940. | ||
10/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1941. Dep: 14/06/1941. | ||
24/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1942. Dep: 05/12/1942. | ||
06/12/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
25/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/11/1944. Dep: 09/12/1944. | ||
15/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 15/12/1945. Dep: 15/12/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 2805 but not taken up | ||
05/01/1946 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3276 |