|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 22/12/1917 | 13/04/1918 | 113 days | General | Boiler number 1550 (Diagram GC56a) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/12/1920 | 26/02/1921 | 85 days | General | Ross Pop |
||
Gorton Works | 22/04/1921 | 22/04/1921 | 1 day | Light Repair | Cylinders bushed to 20" |
||
Gorton Works | 23/09/1922 | 18/11/1922 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1698 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/01/1925 | 07/03/1925 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 1547 (Diagram GC56a) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5427 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/06/1926 | 28/08/1926 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 303 (Diagram GC56b) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/11/1928 | 04/02/1928 | -295 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/03/1929 | 20/04/1929 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/10/1930 | 22/11/1930 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 610 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/03/1932 | 09/04/1932 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 8 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1932 | 07/01/1933 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 05/08/1933 | 23/09/1933 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 599 (Diagram GC56b) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/01/1935 | 02/03/1935 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3001 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/02/1936 | 21/03/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 576 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/03/1937 | 17/04/1937 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 19/03/1938 | 19/03/1938 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 02/07/1938 | 30/07/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3023 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/08/1940 | 12/10/1940 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 571 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/12/1942 | 06/02/1943 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 3036 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/07/1944 | 26/08/1944 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3021 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/11/1946 | 14/12/1946 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3002 (Diagram 13) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1913 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 427 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram GC56a boiler fitted |
||
22/12/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1917. Dep: 13/04/1918. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1550 (Diagram GC56a) |
||
04/12/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1920. Dep: 26/02/1921. Work undertaken: Ross Pop |
||
22/04/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/04/1921. Dep: 22/04/1921. Work undertaken: Cylinders bushed to 20" |
||
23/09/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1922. Dep: 18/11/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1698 (Diagram 13) |
||
04/09/1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 427C | ||
03/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1925. Dep: 07/03/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1547 (Diagram GC56a) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5427 |
||
12/06/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1926. Dep: 28/08/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 303 (Diagram GC56b) |
||
25/04/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
26/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1928. Dep: 04/02/1928. | ||
15/12/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
02/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1929. Dep: 20/04/1929. | ||
24/11/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
18/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1930. Dep: 22/11/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 610 (Diagram 13) |
||
24/11/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
12/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1932. Dep: 09/04/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8 (Diagram 13) |
||
12/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1932. Dep: 07/01/1933. | ||
02/05/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
26/06/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
05/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1933. Dep: 23/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 599 (Diagram GC56b) |
||
19/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1935. Dep: 02/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3001 (Diagram 13) |
||
29/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/02/1936. Dep: 21/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 576 (Diagram 13) |
||
13/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1937. Dep: 17/04/1937. | ||
19/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/03/1938. Dep: 19/03/1938. | ||
02/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1938. Dep: 30/07/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3023 (Diagram 13) |
||
22/06/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
24/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1940. Dep: 12/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 571 (Diagram 13) |
||
21/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
30/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1942. Dep: 06/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3036 (Diagram 13) |
||
22/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1944. Dep: 26/08/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3021 (Diagram 13) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1476 but not taken up | ||
19/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1492 | ||
02/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1946. Dep: 14/12/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3002 (Diagram 13) |
||
14/11/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1492 from Immingham (IMM) | ||
12/1947 | Scrapped | Broken up by Carriage Works: Dukinfield |