|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 26/01/1918 | 22/06/1918 | 148 days | General | Boiler number 1744 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/01/1921 | 19/03/1921 | 57 days | General | Ross Pop |
||
Gorton Works | 10/02/1923 | 21/04/1923 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 424 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/01/1925 | 21/03/1925 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5426 |
||
Gorton Works | 07/08/1926 | 07/08/1926 | 1 day | Light Repair | Converted to oil burnng |
||
Gorton Works | 04/12/1926 | 05/03/1927 | 92 days | General | Oil burning equipment removed |
||
Gorton Works | 30/06/1928 | 13/10/1928 | 106 days | General | Boiler number 1926 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1930 | 24/05/1930 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/10/1931 | 28/11/1931 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1932 | 03/12/1932 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1928 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/03/1934 | 21/04/1934 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 274 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/12/1935 | 28/12/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1934 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/06/1937 | 17/07/1937 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1938 | 13/08/1938 | 50 days | General | New cylinders |
||
Gorton Works | 08/04/1939 | 13/05/1939 | 36 days | Heavy | |||
Gorton Works | 29/03/1941 | 03/05/1941 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3032 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/05/1943 | 29/05/1943 | 22 days | Heavy | Boiler number 3023 (Diagram 13) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1913 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 426 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram GC56a boiler fitted |
||
06/1913 | Naming | Named 'CITY OF CHESTER' | ||
26/01/1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1918. Dep: 22/06/1918. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1744 (Diagram 13) |
||
22/01/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1921. Dep: 19/03/1921. Work undertaken: Ross Pop |
||
10/02/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1923. Dep: 21/04/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 424 (Diagram 13) |
||
05/1923 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 426C | ||
17/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1925. Dep: 21/03/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5426 |
||
07/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/08/1926. Dep: 07/08/1926. Work undertaken: Converted to oil burnng |
||
04/12/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1926. Dep: 05/03/1927. Work undertaken: Oil burning equipment removed |
||
30/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1928. Dep: 13/10/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1926 (Diagram 13) |
||
22/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1930. Dep: 24/05/1930. | ||
09/09/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
17/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1931. Dep: 28/11/1931. | ||
12/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1932. Dep: 03/12/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1928 (Diagram 13) |
||
04/05/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
17/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1934. Dep: 21/04/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 274 (Diagram 13) |
||
27/02/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
07/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1935. Dep: 28/12/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1934 (Diagram 13) |
||
19/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1937. Dep: 17/07/1937. | ||
25/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1938. Dep: 13/08/1938. Work undertaken: New cylinders |
||
08/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/04/1939. Dep: 13/05/1939. | ||
20/07/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
29/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1941. Dep: 03/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3032 (Diagram 13) |
||
29/05/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
28/06/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
21/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
13/12/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
08/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/05/1943. Dep: 29/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3023 (Diagram 13) |
||
22/12/1944 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5426 from Immingham (IMM) | ||
01/1945 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Gorton | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1475 but not taken up |