|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 27/01/1926 | 22/05/1926 | 116 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 12/05/1928 | 18/07/1928 | 68 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 18/08/1930 | 01/09/1930 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 04/02/1931 | 11/02/1931 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/05/1931 | 25/06/1931 | 50 days | General | Boiler number D980 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 24/08/1932 | 07/09/1932 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/10/1933 | 14/11/1933 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 2263 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/04/1935 | 06/06/1935 | 45 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/06/1937 | 04/08/1937 | 52 days | General | Boiler number D1502 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/08/1937 | 25/08/1937 | 21 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/11/1939 | 22/12/1939 | 43 days | General | Boiler number D1564 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/01/1943 | 27/02/1943 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 3038 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 29/12/1944 | 14/01/1945 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 23/04/1946 | 22/05/1946 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 3265 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 25/08/1947 | 13/09/1947 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/07/1949 | 25/08/1949 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 3947 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61460 |
||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1949 | 19/11/1949 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1951 | 15/02/1951 | 14 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 19/09/1952 | 11/10/1952 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 24024 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/10/1952 | 24/10/1952 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/03/1955 | 25/03/1955 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24033 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/04/1955 | 14/04/1955 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/02/1956 | 21/03/1956 | 24 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/11/1956 | 22/11/1956 | 8 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 10/02/1958 | 14/03/1958 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24067 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/01/1959 | 30/01/1959 | 25 days | Light Casual | After collision |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/11/1961 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. | SLS/196201 |
14/01/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Road) | Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. | SLS/196203 |
11/02/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Road) | Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. | SLS/196204 |
25/03/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. | SLS/196205 |
14/07/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D15, D238, D347, D2232/42, D2701, D3075, D3237, D5112, D4190-2 undercoats, D4193-5 motors fitted to body shells, 43054, 60876, 60955/7, 61018, 63343, 63409/10/26, 68037, 90322, 90622/51, 92061/2. Stripping Shop: 65786, 90008, 90132. Outside Stripping Shop: 63423, 65757. Crossing: D24, D244/6/83, D2604. Diesel Shunter Test House: D4189 painted. Sidings: 60953/62/81, 61010, 63368, 63456, 65099, 65720, 65807, 67634, 67788, 68014, 69026, 90113, 92034. Scrap Yard: 61077 being cut up, 61063, 61265/98, 61415/9/43/50/1, 65693, 65751, 67666, 67753/95 partially dismantled, 61411-3/60, 65695, 65741, 67601/23/60, 67707/47/50/75, 68052, 68707, 69017/97 intact. | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/11/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1377 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1213 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
27/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1926. Dep: 22/05/1926. | ||
12/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1928. Dep: 18/07/1928. | ||
18/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/08/1930. Dep: 01/09/1930. | ||
04/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/02/1931. Dep: 11/02/1931. | ||
07/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1931. Dep: 25/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D980 (Diagram 49) |
||
24/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/08/1932. Dep: 07/09/1932. | ||
09/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1933. Dep: 14/11/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2263 (Diagram 49) |
||
23/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1935. Dep: 06/06/1935. | ||
14/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1937. Dep: 04/08/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1502 (Diagram 49) |
||
05/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/08/1937. Dep: 25/08/1937. | ||
10/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1939. Dep: 22/12/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1564 (Diagram 49) |
||
20/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1943. Dep: 27/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3038 (Diagram 49A) |
||
29/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/12/1944. Dep: 14/01/1945. | ||
23/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1946. Dep: 22/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3265 (Diagram 49A) |
||
10/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1460 | ||
25/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/08/1947. Dep: 13/09/1947. | ||
13/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1949. Dep: 25/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3947 (Diagram 49A) Renumbered to BR 61460 |
||
11/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
11/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/11/1949. Dep: 19/11/1949. | ||
04/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
10/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
02/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/02/1951. Dep: 15/02/1951. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
06/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
17/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
19/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1952. Dep: 11/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24024 (Diagram 49A) |
||
13/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/10/1952. Dep: 24/10/1952. | ||
01/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1955. Dep: 25/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24033 (Diagram 49A) |
||
04/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/04/1955. Dep: 14/04/1955. | ||
27/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/02/1956. Dep: 21/03/1956. | ||
15/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/11/1956. Dep: 22/11/1956. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
10/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1958. Dep: 14/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24067 (Diagram 49A) |
||
06/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/01/1959. Dep: 30/01/1959. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
15/09/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61460 from York (North) (50A) | ||
02/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |