|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Unknown Works | 1918 | 05/1918 | General | Boiler number D139 (Diagram 50) |
|||
Darlington Works | 09/05/1923 | 31/08/1923 | 115 days | General | Boiler number D193 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/04/1927 | 29/07/1927 | 98 days | General | Boiler number D1940 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/03/1930 | 07/05/1930 | 56 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/02/1933 | 24/03/1933 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 40 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1936 | 08/08/1936 | 106 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1936 | 12/08/1936 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/02/1940 | 30/03/1940 | 38 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/03/1943 | 06/05/1943 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 24196 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/03/1946 | 21/03/1946 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1912 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 817 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1918. Dep: ?/05/1918. Work undertaken: Boiler number D139 (Diagram 50) |
||
09/05/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1923. Dep: 31/08/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number D193 (Diagram 50) |
||
23/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1927. Dep: 29/07/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1940 (Diagram 50) |
||
13/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1930. Dep: 07/05/1930. | ||
13/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1933. Dep: 24/03/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 40 (Diagram 50) |
||
25/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1936. Dep: 08/08/1936. | ||
10/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/08/1936. Dep: 12/08/1936. | ||
28/09/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
22/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1940. Dep: 30/03/1940. | ||
30/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1943. Dep: 06/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24196 (Diagram 50) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1320 but not taken up | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1694 but not taken up | ||
21/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 21/03/1946. Dep: 21/03/1946. | ||
06/04/1946 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 817 from Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |