|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Unknown Works | 1920 | 05/1920 | General | Boiler number D51 (Diagram 50Sat) |
|||
Unknown Works | 1922 | 08/1922 | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number D231 (Diagram 50) |
|||
Gateshead Works | 11/12/1925 | 19/03/1926 | 99 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 05/04/1929 | 10/06/1929 | 67 days | General | Boiler number E4/AW24 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/03/1933 | 10/05/1933 | 49 days | General | Boiler number D1940 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/05/1933 | 02/06/1933 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1934 | 12/09/1934 | 34 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 14/09/1936 | 30/10/1936 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 2820 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/03/1937 | 20/05/1937 | 66 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 10/10/1938 | 22/12/1938 | 74 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 28/02/1940 | 04/04/1940 | 37 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/05/1942 | 19/05/1942 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 09/03/1943 | 08/04/1943 | 31 days | General | Boiler number HL110 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/05/1943 | 17/06/1943 | 25 days | Light Repair | Both cylinders loose |
||
Darlington Works | 03/11/1945 | 03/11/1945 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1912 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 796 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 50Sat boiler fitted |
||
1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: ?/05/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number D51 (Diagram 50Sat) |
||
1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1922. Dep: ?/08/1922. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number D231 (Diagram 50) |
||
11/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1925. Dep: 19/03/1926. | ||
05/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1929. Dep: 10/06/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/AW24 (Diagram 50) |
||
23/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1933. Dep: 10/05/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1940 (Diagram 50) |
||
24/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/05/1933. Dep: 02/06/1933. | ||
10/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 10/08/1934. Dep: 12/09/1934. | ||
14/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1936. Dep: 30/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2820 (Diagram 50) |
||
16/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/03/1937. Dep: 20/05/1937. | ||
10/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 10/10/1938. Dep: 22/12/1938. | ||
30/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
28/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1940. Dep: 04/04/1940. | ||
27/05/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
02/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/05/1942. Dep: 19/05/1942. | ||
09/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1943. Dep: 08/04/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL110 (Diagram 50) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
24/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/05/1943. Dep: 17/06/1943. Work undertaken: Both cylinders loose |
||
03/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 03/11/1945. Dep: 03/11/1945. | ||
18/12/1945 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 796 from Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1316 but not taken up |