|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Unknown Works | 1921 | 03/1921 | General | ||||
Gateshead Works | 26/04/1923 | 05/06/1923 | 41 days | Heavy | Boiler number D65 (Diagram 50Sat) |
||
Gateshead Works | 22/09/1924 | 19/11/1924 | 59 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 01/07/1926 | 20/10/1926 | 112 days | General | Boiler number D57 (Diagram 50Sat) |
||
Gateshead Works | 02/03/1928 | 18/05/1928 | 78 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number D1941 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 27/10/1930 | 10/12/1930 | 45 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/06/1934 | 05/07/1934 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 24171 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/09/1937 | 25/10/1937 | 49 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 29/08/1940 | 02/10/1940 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 2562 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/07/1942 | 16/07/1942 | 13 days | Unclassified | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 21/08/1942 | 21/08/1942 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 29/09/1943 | 29/10/1943 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24223 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/11/1945 | 07/11/1945 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1912 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 795 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 50Sat boiler fitted |
||
1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1921. Dep: ?/03/1921. | ||
07/03/1921 | Modification | Diagram 50Sat number D57 boiler fitted | ||
26/04/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Heavy) - Arr: 26/04/1923. Dep: 05/06/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number D65 (Diagram 50Sat) |
||
22/09/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1924. Dep: 19/11/1924. | ||
01/07/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1926. Dep: 20/10/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number D57 (Diagram 50Sat) |
||
02/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1928. Dep: 18/05/1928. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number D1941 (Diagram 50) |
||
27/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1930. Dep: 10/12/1930. | ||
02/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1934. Dep: 05/07/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24171 (Diagram 50) |
||
07/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1937. Dep: 25/10/1937. | ||
30/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
29/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1940. Dep: 02/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2562 (Diagram 50) |
||
04/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/07/1942. Dep: 16/07/1942. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
21/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 21/08/1942. Dep: 21/08/1942. | ||
29/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1943. Dep: 29/10/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24223 (Diagram 50) |
||
07/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 07/11/1945. Dep: 07/11/1945. | ||
08/12/1945 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 795 from Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1315 but not taken up |